VT JRS043 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution authorizing the Commissioner of Forests, Parks and Recreation to exchange quit claim deeds with the Vermont Land Trust and the Nature Conservancy in order to confirm the boundary between the Long Trail State Forest and the land co-owned by the Vermont Land Trust and the Nature Conservancy in the Towns of Eden and Belvidere
Title
Joint resolution authorizing the Commissioner of Forests, Parks and Recreation to exchange quit claim deeds with the Vermont Land Trust and the Nature Conservancy in order to confirm the boundary between the Long Trail State Forest and the land co-owned by the Vermont Land Trust and the Nature Conservancy in the Towns of Eden and Belvidere
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House message: House adopted in concurrence |
2022-04-06 | House | Adopted in concurrence |
2022-04-06 | House | Read Third time |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-04-05 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-04-05 | House | Rep. Labor of Morgan reported for the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Read Second time |
2022-04-05 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-31 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-15 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on Notice Calendar per Rule 34 |