VT JRH024 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution authorizing the Green Mountain Girls State educational program to use the State House
Title
Joint resolution authorizing the Green Mountain Girls State educational program to use the State House
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence |
2016-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |
2016-03-22 | House | Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |