VT JRH007 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution authorizing the Green Mountain Boys State educational program to use the State House
Title
Joint resolution authorizing the Green Mountain Boys State educational program to use the State House
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence |
2017-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |
2017-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-14 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |