VT H0878 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by Governor on 6/2/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by Governor on 6/2/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment
Title
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Flory, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 114 (Y: 30 N: 114 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-03-31 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 114 (Y: 30 N: 114 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by Governor on 6/2/16 |
2016-05-31 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/31/16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Flory |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-05 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Emmons of Springfield |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-05-03 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Emmons of Springfield |
2016-05-02 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Emmons of Springfield |
2016-04-29 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Flory, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Flory motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Flory |
2016-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions, as amended, agreed to |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campbell for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Flory for Committee on Institutions |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2016-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |
2016-04-01 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-04-01 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-04-01 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier moved to amend the bill |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-03-31 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-03-31 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield moved to amend the bill |
2016-03-31 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2016-03-31 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 114 |
2016-03-31 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the bill |
2016-03-31 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-31 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield spoke for the committee on Corrections & Institutions |
2016-03-31 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-25 | House | Committee Bill read first time |