VT H0851 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the conduct of forestry operations
Title
An act relating to the conduct of forestry operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-03-18 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-03-17 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-03-17 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury moved to amend the bill |
2016-03-17 | House | Rep. Hebert of Vernon spoke for the committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-03-17 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | House | Action postponed until 3/17/16 as moved by Rep. Hebert of Vernon |
2016-03-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-09 | House | Action postponed until 3/15/16 as moved by Rep. Hebert of Vernon |
2016-02-26 | House | Action postponed until 3/9/2016 as moved by Rep. Hebert of Vernon |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 2/24/16 |
2016-02-24 | House | Committee Bill read first time |