VT H0691 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-03 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Nitka
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-03 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Nitka
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Prohibiting Collusion As An Antitrust Violation
Title
An Act Relating To Prohibiting Collusion As An Antitrust Violation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Nitka | |
2012-05-03 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-30 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-26 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-25 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-25 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to and Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. French of Shrewsbury spoke for the committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-02 | Rep. Botzow of Pownal moved to commit bill to the committee on Judiciary which was agreed to. | |
2012-01-31 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |