VT H0676 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous energy subjects
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous energy subjects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-05-04 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-05-02 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs, Carr of Brandon, Forguites of Springfield, McCormack of Burlington, Parent of St. Albans Town, Sibilia of Dover, Van Wyck of Ferrisburgh, and Yantachka of Charlotte moved to concur in the Senate prop of amend with a further amend thereto |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-04-27 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-16 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2018-03-16 | House | Rep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-16 | House | Rep. Yantachka of Charlotte reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-03-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-01-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |