VT H0622 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, McCormack, and Collamore
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, McCormack, and Collamore
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to obligations for reporting child abuse and neglect and cooperating in investigations of child abuse and neglect
Title
An act relating to obligations for reporting child abuse and neglect and cooperating in investigations of child abuse and neglect
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Pugh [D] | Rep. Sandy Haas [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 40 (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, McCormack, and Collamore |
2016-04-27 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2016-04-26 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-04-26 | House | Speaker appointed Mrowicki of Putney, Haas of Rochester and McCoy of Poultney as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2016-04-26 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Mrowicki of Putney |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare agreed to |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-04-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Health & Welfare on motion of Senator Pollina |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on division, Yeas 15, Nays 8 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health & Welfare |
2016-02-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-02-18 | House | Rep. Mrowicki of Putney, Berry of Manchester, Dame of Essex, Fiske of Enosburgh, French of Randolph, Haas of Rochester, Krowinski of Burlington, McCoy of Poultney, McFaun of Barre Town, Pugh of South Burlington, and Troiano of Stannard moved to amend the bill |
2016-02-12 | House | Rep. Mrowicki of Putney moved to postpone action until 2/19/16 which was agreed to |
2016-02-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-02-11 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 98, Nays = 40 |
2016-02-11 | House | Rep. Mrowicki of Putney reported for the committee on Human Services |
2016-02-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-01-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |