VT H0532 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Signed by Governor on April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Signed by Governor on April 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to fiscal year 2019 budget adjustments
Title
An act relating to fiscal year 2019 budget adjustments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor on April 22, 2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 16, 2019 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 22, 2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 17, 2019 |
2019-03-29 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-03-22 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-21 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-03-21 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-21 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville spoke for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 20, 2019 |