VT H0509 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-30 - Committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Lyons
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-30 - Committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Lyons
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Pollution Control Measures For Lake Champlain And The Other Water Of The State
Title
An Act Relating To Pollution Control Measures For Lake Champlain And The Other Water Of The State
Sponsors
Rep. David Deen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Lyons | |
2010-04-30 | Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-04-30 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Favorable report by Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-04-29 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture | |
2010-03-18 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-03-17 | Report of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to. | |
2010-03-17 | Rep. Deen of Westminster spoke for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2010-03-17 | Read Second Time | |
2010-01-14 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |