VT H0461 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-17 - Delivered to the Governor on 1/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-17 - Delivered to the Governor on 1/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Reimbursement Of Statewide Education Property Taxes That Were Abated Due To Flood Damage
Title
An Act Relating To The Reimbursement Of Statewide Education Property Taxes That Were Abated Due To Flood Damage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-17 | Delivered to the Governor on 1/17/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | Signed by Governor on 1/18/2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Passed the House and Senate on 1/17/2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-01-17 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-01-17 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-01-17 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Carris, Passed -- Needed 12 of 23 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 0 | |
2012-01-17 | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-17 | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-17 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-01-17 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-01-17 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-17 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-01-12 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-12 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-10 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-01-05 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-01-05 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-01-05 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-01-05 | Rep. Manwaring of Wilmington reported for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-05 | Rep. Rep. Olsen of Jamaica spoke for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-01-03 | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-03 | Committee Bill read first time |