VT H0420 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous agricultural subjects
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous agricultural subjects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on June 1, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Agriculture |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-05-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-03-12 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-11 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Tunbridge spoke for the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2021-03-11 | House | Read Second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 10, 2021 |