VT H0292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to town banners over highway rights-of-way

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to town banners over highway rights-of-way

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-05-16SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-05-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, on motion of Senator Bray
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Bray
2019-03-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-03-20HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-20HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-20HouseRep. Shaw of Pittsford moved to amend the bill
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-19HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2019-03-19HouseRep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2019-03-19HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-20HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback