VT H0185 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Regulating Fees And Charges For Propane Gas
Title
An Act Relating To Regulating Fees And Charges For Propane Gas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-04-15 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-14 | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. | |
2011-04-13 | Rep. Rep. Young of Albany reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2011-04-14 | Read Second Time | |
2011-02-08 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |