VT H0172 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Signed by Governor on 4/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Signed by Governor on 4/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Repealing The Sale Or Lease Of The John F. Boylan Airport
Title
An Act Relating To Repealing The Sale Or Lease Of The John F. Boylan Airport
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Signed by Governor on 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Delivered to the Governor on 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-15 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-15 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2011-04-15 | Senator Starr requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2011-04-15 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi and Starr moved to amend bill | |
2011-04-15 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/15/2011 | |
2011-04-15 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Institutions, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-14 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable report by Committee on Institutions | |
2011-04-13 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable report by Committee on Institutions | |
2011-04-12 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-18 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions | |
2011-03-16 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-03-11 | Rep. Rep. Shaw of Pittsford reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions | |
2011-03-15 | Read Second Time | |
2011-02-04 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |