VT H0114 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Electrical Installations
Title
An Act Relating To Electrical Installations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2011-02-18 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-02-18 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 67 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 31, Nays = 101 | |
2011-02-18 | Motion to recommit to Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs by Rep. Donahue of Northfield disagreed to | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Koch of Barre Town agreed to | |
2011-02-17 | Action Postponed until 2/18/2011 as moved by Rep Stevens of Waterbury | |
2011-02-16 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-02-16 | Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to | |
2011-02-16 | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury, recommended for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Read Second Time | |
2011-01-27 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |