VT H0042 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to appointing municipal clerks and treasurers and to municipal audit penalties
Title
An act relating to appointing municipal clerks and treasurers and to municipal audit penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2017-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Collamore for Committee, text |
2017-04-27 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Collamore, Ayer, and Pearson |
2017-04-14 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2017-04-12 | House | Speaker appointed Gardner of Richmond, Hubert of Milton and Lewis of Berlin as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-04-12 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Gardner of Richmond |
2017-04-12 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2017-04-07 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Clarkson, Ayer, Collamore, Pearson, Sears, and White; text |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed |
2017-03-15 | House | Read Third time |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-14 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2017-03-14 | House | Rep. Gardner of Richmond reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-01-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |