VT H0006 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Powers And Immunities Of The Liquor Control Investigators
Title
An Act Relating To Powers And Immunities Of The Liquor Control Investigators
Sponsors
Rep. James Condon [D] | Rep. Mark Higley [R] | Rep. Ronald Hubert [R] | Rep. Patricia Komline [R] |
Rep. Peter Perley [R] | Rep. Brian Savage [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2011-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-29 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2011-04-29 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-29 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-03 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-02-01 | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to and Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-01-28 | Rep. Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2011-02-01 | Read Second Time | |
2011-01-07 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |