VA SJR397 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ397ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ397ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Person-center practices in providing services. Requests the Secretary of Health and Human Resources and human services agencies to adopt and implement person-center practices in providing services to citizens.
Title
Person-centered practice; SHHR & human services agencies to adopt & implement in providing services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ397ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Taken up | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103134D |