VA SJR330 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ330ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ330ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; service needs of individuals with autism and autism spectrum disorders transitioning from secondary schools; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study the service needs of individuals with autism and autism spectrum disorders transitioning from public and private secondary schools, including needs related to housing, employment, and day support services.
Title
Autism and autism spectrum disorders; Joint Commission on Health Care to study service needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ330ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Taken up |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13102554D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Education
Health
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Education
Health
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports