VA SJR327 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ327ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ327ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable James Brady Murray.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable James Brady Murray.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ327ER) |
2015-02-13 | House | Agreed to by House |
2015-02-06 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2015-02-06 | House | Received |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Presented 15103561D |