VA SB953 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Muzzleloader firearms; definition. Incorporates the Virginia criminal law definition of a muzzleloader into the current statutory definitions of muzzleloading pistol, muzzleloading rifle, and muzzleloading shotgun located in Title 29.1 (Game, Inland Fisheries and Boating).
Title
Muzzleloader firearms; definition.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 161 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB953ER) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-10 | House | Amendment by Delegate Marshall, D.W. agreed to |
2017-02-10 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102126D |