VA SB869 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hearing notice by localities. Provides that in any instance in which a locality in Planning District 23 has submitted a timely notice of public hearing to a newspaper published or having general circulation in the locality and the newspaper fails to publish the notice, such locality shall be deemed to have met certain notice requirements so long as the notice was published in the next available edition. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2022.
Title
Hearing notice by localities; timely notice related to planning or zoning matter to newspaper, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB869ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (73-Y 23-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB869S2 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senator DeSteph agreed to 20107526D-S2 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senator withdrawn 20107359D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendments reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20107526D-S2 (DeSteph) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20107359D-S1 (DeSteph) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20103684D-E |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB869E |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (10-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103684D |
Same As/Similar To
HB166 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)