VA HB166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hearing notice by localities. Provides that in any instance in which a locality in Planning District 23 has submitted a timely notice of public hearing to a newspaper published or having general circulation in the locality and the newspaper fails to publish the notice, such locality shall be deemed to have met certain notice requirements so long as the notice was published in the next available edition. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2022.
Title
Hearing notice by localities; timely notice related to planning or zoning matter to newspaper, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 22 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB166ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (79-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108232D-S1 (79-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB166S1 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Substitute by Senator DeSteph agreed to 20108232D-S1 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20108232D-S1 (DeSteph) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (73-Y 25-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103028D-E |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB166E |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2019-12-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-12-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-12-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103028D |
Same As/Similar To
SB869 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)