VA SB720 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dissemination, etc., of criminal history record information; civil action. Creates a civil action against any person who disseminates, publishes, or maintains or causes to be disseminated, published, or maintained the criminal history record information of an individual pertaining to that individual's charge or arrest for a criminal offense and solicits, requests, or accepts money or other thing of value for removing such information. Such person shall be liable to the individual who is the subject of the information for actual damages or $500, whichever is greater, in addition to reasonable attorney fees and costs.
Title
Arrest photos on Internet; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB720ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105068D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB720H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105068D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105068D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15101234D-E |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB720E |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101234D |