VA SB651 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0895)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0895)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fairfax County; policemen's pension and retirement board. Increases from seven to eight the number of members on the policemen's pension and retirement board created in a county that has adopted the urban county executive form of government (Fairfax County) and increases from two to three the number of members of such board who shall be members of such retirement system and employed by the county police department as sworn police officers and who have been elected by the members of the retirement system who are employed by the police department as sworn police officers.
Title
Fairfax County; policemen's pension and retirement board.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] |
Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0895) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 895 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB651ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104013D |