VA SB617 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; voter satellite offices for absentee voting in person. Authorizes the establishment of voter satellite offices by governing bodies of counties and cities for purposes of absentee voting in person. No change in any voter satellite office, including the creation of a new voter satellite office or abolishment of an existing voter satellite office, may be enacted within the 60 days immediately preceding a general election. The bill requires general registrars to post notice of the locations of all voter satellite offices within the locality, and their days and hours of operation, not later than 55 days prior to any election. Requirements for polling places, including accessibility for persons with disabilities, changes of location due to emergency circumstances, and funding, apply to voter satellite offices. The provisions of the bill are applicable to elections beginning with the general election on November 3, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; voter satellite offices for absentee voting in person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-20SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17SenatePrinted as engrossed 20102713D-E
2020-01-17SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB617E
2020-01-17SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-17SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-17SenateRead second time
2020-01-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102713D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242701.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242701.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback