VA SB5080 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Telemedicine services; originating site. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance services to provide for payment of medical assistance for medically necessary health care services provided through telemedicine services, regardless of the originating site or whether the patient is accompanied by a health care provider at the time such services are provided. "Originating site" is defined in the bill as any location where the patient is located, including any medical care facility or office of a health care provider, the home of the patient, the patient's place of employment, or any public or private primary or secondary school or postsecondary institution of higher education at which the person to whom services are provided is located. The bill also requires each (i) insurer proposing to issue individual or group accident and sickness insurance policies providing hospital, medical and surgical, or major medical coverage on an expense-incurred basis; (ii) corporation providing individual or group accident and sickness subscription contracts; and (iii) health maintenance organization providing a health care plan for health care services to provide coverage for telemedicine services regardless of the originating site and whether the patient is accompanied by a health care provider at the time such services are provided. The bill also provides that no health care provider who provides health care services via telemedicine services shall be required to use proprietary technology or applications to be reimbursed for providing telemedicine services, and requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to continue to reimburse health care providers for Medicaid-covered services delivered via audio-only equipment and by telemedicine services until July 1, 2021.
Title
Telemedicine services; originating site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-09 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053) | |
2020-11-09 | House | Enacted, Chapter 53 (effective 11/9/20) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB5080ER2) |
2020-11-09 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-11-09 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2020-11-09 | House | VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-11-09 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5080ER) |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed House with amendments (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-09-25 | House | Amendments by Delegate Sickles agreed to |
2020-09-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5080S1 |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20200889D-S1 |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Incorporates SB5087 (Dunnavant) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20200889D-S1 |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200554D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5087 (Similar To) 2020-08-19 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB5046 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
HB5046 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |