VA SB497 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judge; Second Judicial Circuit; resident judge in Counties of Accomack and Northampton. Requires that one judge from the Second Judicial Circuit be a resident and domiciliary of the County of Accomack or Northampton and preside regularly in the Counties of Accomack and Northampton. Judge; Second Judicial Circuit; resident judge in Counties of Accomack and Northampton. Requires that one judge from the Second Judicial Circuit be a resident and domiciliary of the County of Accomack or Northampton and preside regularly in the Counties of Accomack and Northampton.
Title
Judge; Second Judicial Circuit, resident judge in Counties of Accomack and Northampton.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 596 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB497ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 22101825D-E |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB497E |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101825D |
Subjects
Accomack County
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Judicial Circuits
Northampton County
Uncodified Legislation
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Judicial Circuits
Northampton County
Uncodified Legislation