VA SB287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Newport News. Amends provisions related to the city's boundary by adding references to bodies of water located within the city or located between its territory and any other jurisdiction. The bill also removes a provision that requires certain procedural matters of council to take place on July 1.
Title
Charter; City of Newport News.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193) | |
2012-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 193 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB287ER) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-0Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Assigned Local Gov sub: Charter | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102870D |
Same As/Similar To
HB457 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)