VA SB176 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Consent to organ donation. Eliminates the requirement that a person indicate his willingness to make an anatomical gift every time he renews or replaces his license.
Title
Organ donation; indication consent to remain on driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0135) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 135 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2016 | |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB176ER) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-12-31 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101729D |
Same As/Similar To
HB653 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0743)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 292.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 342 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |