VA SB1376 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State park master plans; update schedule. Changes the requirement that the Department and Board of Conservation and Recreation review and update the master plan for each state park from once every five years to once every 10 years.
Title
State park master plans; update schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 185 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1376ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103833D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2226 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)