VA HB2226 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State park master plans; update schedule. Changes the requirement that the Department and Board of Conservation and Recreation review and update the master plan for each state park from once every five years to once every 10 years.
Title
State park master plans; update schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2226ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15101362D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1376 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)