VA SB1334 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Pilot program for broadband capacity; municipal broadband authorities. Expands the existing broadband pilot program to allow for the participation of municipalities and government-owned broadband authorities in order to provide broadband service to unserved areas of the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband capacity; expands existing pilot program, municipal broadband authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N)
2021-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101476D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback