VA SB1334 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1334
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; broadband capacity pilot program. Expands an existing pilot program under which Dominion Energy and Appalachian Power are authorized to provide or make available broadband capacity to Internet service providers in areas of the Commonwealth that are unserved by broadband to include municipal Internet service providers. The current program is restricted to nongovernmental Internet service providers.
Title
Broadband capacity; expands existing pilot program, municipal broadband authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1334ER) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-16 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101476D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1334 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
HB1923 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
HB1923 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
HB1923 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
HB1923 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)