VA SB1253 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Smoking in certain public areas. Allows localities to ban smoking in designated public parks, public beaches, and similar outdoor public areas.
Title
Smoking; localities to ban in designated public parks, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 4-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13102254D |