VA SB1156 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1156
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Technology Development Grant Fund created. Creates the Technology Development Grant Fund to make grant payments to a qualified technology company that makes a capital investment of at least $64 million at a facility in Fairfax County and creates at least 1,500 new full-time jobs at the facility. A qualified technology company would be eligible for an aggregate of $22.5 million in grants paid over four years if it meets performance parameters and complies with the terms of a memorandum of understanding agreed upon by the company, the Commonwealth, and the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority.
Title
Technology Development Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 10-N) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0271) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 271 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 22, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1156ER) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-12 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed House (90-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-07 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102102D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1156 (Carry Over) 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote