VA SB1156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1156
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Technology Development Grant Fund created. Creates the Technology Development Grant Fund to make grant payments to a qualified technology company that makes a capital investment of at least $64 million at a facility in Fairfax County and creates at least 1,500 new full-time jobs at the facility. A qualified technology company would be eligible for an aggregate of $22.5 million in grants paid over four years if it meets performance parameters and complies with the terms of a memorandum of understanding agreed upon by the company, the Commonwealth, and the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority.
Title
Technology Development Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-07 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102102D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1156 (Carry Over) 2021-02-07 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Appropriations by voice vote