VA SB1121 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1121

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Birth certificates; amendments. Provides that every request for an amendment to a birth certificate shall be reviewed to determine whether the requested amendment can be made administratively or if a judicial order is required for the amendment. The bill also requires the Department of Health to make information about the process by which amendments to a birth certificate may be requested and are reviewed available on its website. Such information shall include a standard form for requests for amendments to a birth certificate. Birth certificates; amendments. Provides that every request for an amendment to a birth certificate shall be reviewed to determine whether the requested amendment can be made administratively or if a judicial order is required for the amendment. The bill also requires the Department of Health to make information about the process by which amendments to a birth certificate may be requested and are reviewed available on its website. Such information shall include a standard form for requests for amendments to a birth certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birth certificates; amending certificate, review of request.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1121ER)
2021-02-25SenateEnrolled
2021-02-23SenateTitle replaced 21200133D-H1
2021-02-23SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N)
2021-02-19HousePassed House with substitute (78-Y 22-N)
2021-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1121H1
2021-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21200133D-H1
2021-02-19HousePassed by temporarily
2021-02-19HouseRead third time
2021-02-18HouseRead second time
2021-02-16HouseCommittee substitute printed 21200133D-H1
2021-02-16HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2021-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1121S1
2021-01-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103272D-S1
2021-01-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-01-25SenateRead second time
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103272D-S1
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N)
2021-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-12-22SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-12-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101423D

Same As/Similar To

SB1121 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321269(n/a)See Bill Text
321269.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1121
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1121+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1121S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1121H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1121ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0237+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200133D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21200133.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1121F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1121FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1121FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1121FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0040+SB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0080SB1121+SB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0122SB1121+SB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1201V0004+SB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12V0030+SB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1778+SB1121
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0323SB1121+SB1121

Bill Comments 750

feedback