VA SB1121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1121
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Birth certificates; amendments. Provides that, in cases regarding amendments to birth certificates not already set out in the Code of Virginia, an amendment to a birth certificate shall be evaluated by the State Registrar through an administrative process pursuant to regulations as may be adopted by the State Board of Health. The bill requires the State Registrar to establish and publicize an internal process for modifying birth certificates and to make available to the public on its website a standard form a birth certificate made available to the public on its website. The bill also provides that when an applicant requests a change to a vital record that requires a judicial order, the vital record shall not be amended and the State Registrar shall so advise the applicant in a written notice that the applicant has the right to petition the court. Birth certificates; amendments. Provides that, in cases regarding amendments to birth certificates not already set out in the Code of Virginia, an amendment to a birth certificate shall be evaluated by the State Registrar through an administrative process pursuant to regulations as may be adopted by the State Board of Health. The bill requires the State Registrar to establish and publicize an internal process for modifying birth certificates and to make available to the public on its website a standard form a birth certificate made available to the public on its website. The bill also provides that when an applicant requests a change to a vital record that requires a judicial order, the vital record shall not be amended and the State Registrar shall so advise the applicant in a written notice that the applicant has the right to petition the court.
Title
Birth certificates; an amendment of a certificate shall be evaluated by the State Registrar.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1121S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103272D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103272D-S1 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101423D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote