VA SB1112 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Research and development tax credits. Provides that the research and development expenses tax credit and the major research and development expenses tax credit shall be available against the bank franchise tax for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2021. Under current law, the credits are available only against the individual and corporate income tax. Research and development tax credits. Provides that the research and development expenses tax credit and the major research and development expenses tax credit shall be available against the bank franchise tax for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2021. Under current law, the credits are available only against the individual and corporate income tax.
Title
Research and development expenses; tax credit available against the bank franchise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101371D-E |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1112E |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101371D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1112 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |