VA SB1112 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1112
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Research and development tax credits. Provides that the research and development expenses tax credit and the major research and development expenses tax credit shall be available against the bank franchise tax for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2021. Under current law, the credits are available only against the individual and corporate income tax.
Title
Research and development expenses; tax credit available against the bank franchise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 48 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 22, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1112ER) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21101371D-E |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1112E |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101371D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1112 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Finance by voice vote
HB1916 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
HB1916 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
HB1916 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
HB1916 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |