VA SB1097 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1097
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; witness signature not required. Repeals the requirement that an absentee ballot be opened in the presence of a witness and signed by such witness.
Title
Absentee voting; witness signature not required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100137D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1097 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 702.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |