VA HJR201 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-19-1)
Status: Passed on January 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-23 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ201ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 40-19-1)
Status: Passed on January 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-23 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ201ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable William Kyle Barlow.
Title
Commending the Honorable William Kyle Barlow.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ201ER) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Taken up for immediate consideration | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Received | |
2012-01-20 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-19 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 12103840D | |
2012-01-17 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12103840D |