VA HJR103 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ103ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ103ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Christopher Newport University; state-run retirement savings plan for people without employer-provided plans; report. Requests Christopher Newport University to study the feasibility and merits of a state-run retirement savings plan for employers and their employees who do not have access to an employer-provided retirement savings plan.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; CNU to study feasibility and merits of a plan.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ103ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ103H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106672D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106672D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102697D |