VA HJR103 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ103ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ103ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; Virginia's Line of Duty Act; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study Virginia's Line of Duty Act, the current and projected future costs of benefits awarded thereunder, and the advisability of coordinating those benefits with additional benefits paid under other state and federal programs.
Title
Virginia's Line of Duty Act; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (20-Y 78-N) (Y: 20 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (20-Y 78-N) (Y: 20 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ103ER) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N) |
2014-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 14105597D-H2 |
2014-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Puckett, Marsh, Watkins |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Delegates: Jones, Landes, Joannou |
2014-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (20-Y 78-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 14105097D-S1 (20-Y 78-N) |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ103S1 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105097D-S1 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reading waived (37-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105097D-S1 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reading waived |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ103H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Motion to pass by withdrawn |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104650D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Taken up |
2014-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104650D-H1 |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102416D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports