VA HB997 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child care providers; fingerprint-based criminal background checks; sunset and contingency expiration. Repeals the sunset and contingency expiration of the requirement that the following individuals undergo fingerprint-based national criminal history background checks: (i) applicants for employment by, employees of, applicants to serve as volunteers with, and volunteers with any licensed family day system, child day center exempt from licensure due to its operation by a religious institution, registered family day home, or family day home approved by a family day system; (ii) applicants for licensure as a family day system, registration as a family day home, or approval as a family day home by a family day system, as well as agents of such applicants and any adult living in such family day home; and (iii) individuals who apply for or enter into a contract with the Department of Social Services under which a child day center, family day home, or child day program will provide child care services funded by the Child Care and Development Block Grant Act, as well as the applicant's current or prospective employees and volunteers, agents, and any adult living in the child day center or family day home.
Title
Child care providers; fingerprint-based criminal background checks, repeals sunset.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB997ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Education by voice vote |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102068D |
Same As/Similar To
SB675 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)