VA HB979 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-09 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School board duties; appointment and employment of division superintendents; oversight. Requires each school board to appoint, employ, and provide oversight for a division superintendent and provides that nothing in the Code of Virginia or the regulations of the Board of Education shall be construed to prohibit the school board from providing such oversight.
Title
School boards; duties, appointment and employment of division superintendents, oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-09 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104407D |