VA HB967 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement officers; campus police officers; definitions. Includes within various definitions of "law-enforcement officers" campus police officers at institutions of higher education.
Title
Campus police officers; included in definition of law-enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-08 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103148D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 402.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |