VA HB872 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax exemption; certain data centers. Extends the sunset date for the sales and use tax exemption for certain data centers from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2035, and eliminates the sunset date of June 30, 2020, for provisions of the existing law that allow the owner of the data center to count the jobs created and investments made by tenants to count toward the overall jobs and investment criteria for the exemption. If an entity previously created 50 new jobs at a data center in the Commonwealth in order to qualify for the exemption, those 50 jobs may be relocated to a new data center in the Commonwealth with a capital investment of at least $500 million on or after July 1, 2016, and count toward the new jobs requirement for the new data center to qualify for the exemption. The bill also makes a technical correction regarding a subdivision that is erroneously set out twice in the Code.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for certain data centers.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 343 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB872ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2016-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB872H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment by Delegate Marshall, R.G. rejected |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105126D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105126D-H1 |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101730D |
Same As/Similar To
SB64 (Same As) 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)